+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (6)
On December 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On December 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (67-2-6)
On June 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitution (Prieto)
On October 18, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Prieto)
On June 18, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 2, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
+ − Votes (2)
December 19, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 5
June 18, 2012: r/favorably
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor