+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.355.
On January 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-0)
- Substituted for S2237
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
On January 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (69-0-0)
On January 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
+ − Votes (5)
January 5, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 8
January 5, 2018: SUBSTITUTE FOR S2237
- Present/NV: 40
June 19, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
January 23, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
January 12, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 2