+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.16.
On December 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-17)
- Substituted for S21 (2R)
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On December 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (49-24-6)
On December 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On November 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On November 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On November 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
+ − Votes (5)
December 17, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 1
December 17, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 17
December 17, 2020: SUB FOR S21
- Present/NV: 40
December 15, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
November 9, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor