+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.354.
On January 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
On January 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On January 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (33-0)
- Substituted for S1988 (1R)
On December 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On October 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On July 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (74-0-2)
On June 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Mukherji)
On April 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (7)
January 8, 2018: CONCUR IN SA
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 10
January 5, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
January 5, 2018: SUBSTITUTE FOR S1988
- Present/NV: 40
December 14, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
October 13, 2016: r/Sca
- Yeas: 5
June 30, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 4
April 4, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor