+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.157.
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
- Substituted for S2333
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On July 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 19, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 19, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR S2333
- Present/NV: 40
June 1, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
June 30, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 12, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor