+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.74.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
- Substituted for S731 (SCS)
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
On May 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
On January 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (5)
March 13, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
March 13, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR S731
- Present/NV: 40
February 6, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 13
May 26, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 8
May 12, 2016: r/ACS
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor