+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (5)
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
On January 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (45-30-0)
On December 13, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On September 27, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On January 10, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
+ − Votes (2)
January 28, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 5
December 13, 2012: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3