+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (9)
On August 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2015, c.78.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
- Substituted for S2211 (1R)
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
On March 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
On February 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On June 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On January 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
+ − Votes (6)
June 29, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 40
June 29, 2015: SUBSTITUTE FOR S2211
- Present/NV: 40
May 7, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
March 9, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
February 5, 2015: r/Aca
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 5, 2014: r/favorably
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1