+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2018, c.107.
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
- Substituted for S2140
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
On March 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 25, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 25, 2018: SUB FOR S2140
- Present/NV: 40
June 18, 2018: r/favorably
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
March 26, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
February 1, 2018: r/Aca
- Yeas: 5