+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (4)
On August 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
On July 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
On June 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
+ − Votes (2)
July 30, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
June 17, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 6