+ − Full Texts (14)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.235.
On July 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (48-20-0)
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (21-9)
- Substituted for S3217 (1R)
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (22-0) (Cunningham)
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On November 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading (without recommendation)
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
On June 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (50-27-0)
On June 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On January 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
+ − Votes (10)
July 31, 2017: CONCUR IN SA
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 11
July 13, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR S3217
- Present/NV: 39
July 13, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 9
June 29, 2017: AMEND
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 18
June 29, 2017: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
June 15, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
November 10, 2016: r w/o rec.
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 27, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 3
June 20, 2016: r/Aca
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
February 4, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor