+ − Full Texts (15)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-16-3)
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (23-14)
- Substituted for S1048 (2R)
On December 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (24-0) (Vitale)
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (27-0) (Vitale)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On October 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
On June 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (54-19-4)
On May 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On January 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
+ − Votes (9)
January 13, 2020: SUB FOR S1048
- Present/NV: 40
January 13, 2020: CONCUR IN SA
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 7
January 13, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
December 16, 2019: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
December 16, 2019: AMEND
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 16
March 4, 2019: r/Sca
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
October 15, 2018: r/favorably
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
June 25, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 2
May 17, 2018: r/favorably
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor