+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (5)
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (78-0-1)
On June 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Greenwald)
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
+ − Votes (2)
June 26, 2014: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
June 12, 2014: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor