+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (4)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (48-24-3)
On February 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 10, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
+ − Votes (2)
February 21, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 4
February 13, 2013: r/Aca
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor