+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.70.
On March 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-1-1)
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (35-0)
- Substituted for S1739 (1R)
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (25-0) (Oroho)
On November 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On September 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
On February 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (70-9-0)
On January 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (8)
March 1, 2021: CONCUR IN SA
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 10
February 19, 2021: SUB FOR S1739
- Present/NV: 40
February 19, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
January 28, 2021: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
January 28, 2021: AMEND
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 15
November 9, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor