+ − Full Texts (13)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
On June 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (44-0-32)
On June 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (21-0)
- Substituted for S2616 (3R)
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (25-0) (Ruiz)
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (29-0) (Ruiz)
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
On December 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
On October 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (9)
June 29, 2017: CONCUR IN SA
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 4
June 26, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR S2616
- Present/NV: 40
June 26, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 21
- Present/NV: 19
June 22, 2017: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
June 22, 2017: AMEND
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 15
June 15, 2017: r/Sca
- Yeas: 7
January 9, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
December 19, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
October 27, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor