+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (11)
On September 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.227.
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0)
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (38-0)
- Substituted for S2056 (1R)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On November 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
On November 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
On October 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
On October 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
+ − Votes (6)
June 3, 2021: CONCUR IN SA
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 8
June 3, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 3, 2021: SUB FOR S2056
- Present/NV: 40
March 22, 2021: r/Sca
- Yeas: 5
November 16, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
October 8, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor