+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (7)
On November 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (73-1-2)
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On December 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
+ − Votes (4)
November 8, 2021: r/Sca
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
March 17, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 11
December 7, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor