+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (9)
On August 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On August 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (25-14)
- Substituted for S1513 (2R)
On July 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (26-0) (Cruz-Perez)
On July 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
On June 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (73-5-0)
On June 15, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
+ − Votes (7)
August 27, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
August 27, 2020: SUB FOR S1513
- Present/NV: 40
July 30, 2020: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
July 30, 2020: AMEND
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 14
July 16, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
June 18, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
June 16, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor