+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
- Substituted for S1730 (1R)
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On December 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
On December 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On January 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
+ − Votes (6)
January 13, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
January 13, 2020: SUB FOR S1730
- Present/NV: 40
January 6, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
December 16, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
December 12, 2019: r/favorably
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2019: r/Aca
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor