+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (7)
On December 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On December 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On December 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On October 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
On September 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (72-3-3)
On August 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
+ − Votes (3)
December 16, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 12
September 24, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
August 10, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor