+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA DV 256-76 03/22/2018 HJ 10 P. 13
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Suspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): MA VV by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 HJ 8 P. 69
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection HJ 7 P. 49
- Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): MA VV by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 125
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Removed from Consent (Rep. Pearl) 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 4
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 9 P. 14
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/13/2018 11:00 AM LOB 308
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/11/2018 11:30 AM LOB 308
On November 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Election Law HJ 1 P. 25