+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA DV 208-78; HJ 24, PG. 883
- Special Order (Rep A. Christie): MF VV; HJ 24, PG. 883
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 9-5; RC); HC19, PG. 423
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/2/2015 12:30 PM LOB 306
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/19/2015 10:00 AM LOB 306
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; HJ 12, PG. 220
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor