+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/30/2023; Chapter 0144; Effective 07/01/2023
On June 21, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 15
On June 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/15/2023); SJ 20
On June 8, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 4
On May 31, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/30/2023 (Vote 19-0; CC)
On May 23, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/30/2023 11:00 am LOB 302-304
On May 17, 2023 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/23/2023 10:00 am LOB 302-304
- Subcommittee Work Session: 05/30/2023 10:00 am LOB 302-304
- Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2023-1892h: 05/23/2023 10:30 am LOB 302-304
On May 3, 2023 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/10/2023 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 05/03/2023 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On April 5, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/12/2023 01:45 pm LOB 302-304
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/26/2023; SJ 5
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/26/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 7A
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 4
- Hearing: 01/24/2023, Room 100, SH, 09:15 am; SC 7
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor