+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/24/2013; Chapter 0266; Effective 07/24/2013
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled; HJ52, PG.1714
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2187e Adopted, VV
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2187e Adopted; HJ52, PG.1712
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sen. Prescott Moved Concur with House Amendment #1857h, NT, MA, VV
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #1857h(NT): MA VV; HJ49, PG.1570-1571
- Amendment #1857h(NT): AA VV; HJ49, PG.1570-1571
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1857h (New Title); HC42, PG.1450-1451
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1857h(NT) for June 5 (Vote 19-0; CC); HC42, PG.1429
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Continued Executive Session: 5/21/2013 1:00 PM LOB 304
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 5/14/2013 11:00 AM LOB 304 ==RECESSED==
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 5/1/2013 10:45 AM LOB 304
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 4/16/2013 1:00 PM LOB 303
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; HJ35, PG.1191
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendments 1080s, 1111s, MA, VV; OT3rdg
- Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2013-1111s, AA, VV;
- Committee Amendment 1080s, NT, AA, VV;
- Sen. Kelly Moved to Remove SB 98 from the Consent Calendar
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1080s, NT, 3/28/13; Vote 5-0; CC; SC13
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: === TIME CHANGE === 3/6/13, Room 101, LOB, 9:30 a.m.; SC10
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 3/6/13, Room 101, LOB, 9:00 a.m.; SC9
On January 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources; SJ 4
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor