+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/30/2023; Chapter 0143; Effective 08/29/2023
On June 21, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 15
On June 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/15/2023); SJ 20
On May 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-1846e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 05/18/2023); SJ 16
On May 25, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-1846e: AA VV (in recess of) 05/18/2023
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/04/2023 HJ 13 P. 12
On April 14, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/29/2023 10:30 am LOB 306-308
On March 30, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/29/2023 (Vote 16-0; CC)
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration
- Public Hearing: 03/29/2023 10:30 am LOB 306-308
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0856s, AA, VV; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0856s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0856s, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 13
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/21/2023, Room 103, SH, 09:30 am; SC 11
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 4
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor