+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 06/05/2019 HJ 17 P. 23
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 06/05/2019 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 27 P. 9
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/22/2019 10:00 am LOB 202
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/28/2019 10:00 am LOB 202
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/14/2019 11:15 am LOB 202
- Referred to Ways and Means 05/08/2019 HJ 15 P. 3
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1571h: MA VV 05/08/2019 HJ 15 P. 3
- Amendment # 2019-1571h: AA VV 05/08/2019 HJ 15 P. 3
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1571h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 23 P. 4
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am LOB 306
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2019 02:00 pm LOB 306
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/10/2019 11:00 am LOB 306
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/02/2019 10:30 am LOB 306
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 11 P. 69
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0851s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; SJ 8
- Committee Amendment # 2019-0851s, AA, VV; 03/14/2019; SJ 8
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0851s, 03/14/2019; SC 13
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/20/2019, Room 100, SH, 09:00 am; SC 11
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Ways and Means; SJ 4
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor