+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 11
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/24/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:15 am; SC 7
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Education; SJ 4