+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 18, 2023 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 7
On May 10, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/03/2023 09:00 am LOB 206-208
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 05/03/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC)
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/12/2023 11:30 am LOB 206-208
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Judiciary
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0398s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0398s, AA, VV; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0398s, 02/09/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9A
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/24/2023, Room 103, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 7
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 4
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor