+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Law Without Signature 09/19/2019; Chapter 344; Effective 11/18/2019; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
On September 19, 2019 in the House:
- Veto Overridden 09/19/2019: RC 238-117 by Required Two-Thirds Vote HJ 22 P. 11
On September 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 88 Become Law: RC 17Y-7N, Veto Overridden by necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; SJ 22
On July 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor 07/12/2019
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 53
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); SJ 21
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sen. Sherman Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 06/13/2019; SJ 20
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1667h: MA RC 263-90 05/23/2019 HJ 16 P. 35
- Amendment # 2019-1667h: AA VV 05/23/2019 HJ 16 P. 35
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1667h for 05/23/2019 (Vote 18-3; RC) HC 25 P. 9
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/07/2019 10:00 am LOB 205
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 04/25/2019 10:00 am LOB 104
- Public Hearing: 04/23/2019 10:00 am LOB 205
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 11 P. 72
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1210s, RC 17Y-7N, MA; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; SJ 9
- Sen. Gray Floor Amendment # 2019-1210s, AA, VV; 03/21/2019; SJ 9
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2019; SC 14
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0606s: Sections 1-5 and 7, MA, VV, Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/07/2019; SJ 7
- Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0606s: Sections 6 and 7, RC 16Y-8N, MA; 03/07/2019; SJ 7
- The Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 03/07/2019; SJ 7
- Sen. Gray Moved to divide the Question on Ought to Pass as Amended # 2019-0606s: Sections 6 and 7; and Sections 1-5 and 7, 03/07/2019; SJ 7
- Committee Amendment # 2019-0606s: Line 4 RC 9Y-15N, AF; 03/07/2019; SJ 7
- Committee Amendment # 2019-0606s: Lines 1 and 2, AA, VV; 03/07/2019; SJ 7
- The Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 03/07/2019; SJ 7
- Sen. Feltes Moved to divide the Question on Committee Amendment # 2019-0606s: Lines 1 and 2; and Line 4; 03/07/2019; SJ 7
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0606s, 03/07/2019; SC 12
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 101, LOB, 01:00 pm; SC 9
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 4
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
September 19, 2019: Veto Override
- Yeas: 238
- Nays: 117
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 25
September 19, 2019: VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 24
May 23, 2019: OTPA
- Yeas: 263
- Nays: 90
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 40
March 21, 2019: Ought to Pass w/Amendment
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 24
March 7, 2019: Committee Amendment 0606s Line 4
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 24
March 7, 2019: Ought to Pass w/Amendment Sections 6 and 7
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 24