+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2017; Chapter 0209; Effective 09/08/2017
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); SJ 20
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/22/2017 HJ 19 P. 23
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2207e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/08/2017); SJ 19
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2207e: AA VV 06/08/2017 HJ 18 P. 9
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 06/01/2017 HJ 17 P. 5
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/01/2017 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 26 P. 6
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/17/2017 11:00 AM LOB 302
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 05/09/2017 01:20 PM LOB 302
- Subcommittee Work Session: 05/10/2017 01:15 PM LOB 302
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 05/03/2017 10:30 AM LOB 302
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 11 P. 27
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendments 2017-1049s and 2017-1170s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; SJ 12
- Sen. Innis Floor Amendment #2017-1170s, AA, VV; 03/30/2017; SJ 12
- Committee Amendment #2017-1049s, AA, VV; 03/30/2017; SJ 12
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1049s, 03/30/2017;
- Special Order SB 86 to the beginning of Thursday 03/30/2017 Calendar, Without Objection, MA; 03/29/2017;
- Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove SB 86 from the Consent Calendar; 03/29/2017; SJ 11
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1049s, 03/29/2017; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 16
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/31/2017, Room 100, SH, 01:15 pm; SC 8
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 5
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor