+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 08/08/2023; Chapter 0240
- I. Section 6 Effective 11/01/2024
- II. Remainder Effective 08/08/2023
On July 28, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 18
On July 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On July 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2245e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On July 17, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2245e: AA VV (in recess of) 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 17
On June 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Birdsell Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 06/15/2023; SJ 19
On June 8, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-2025h: AA VV 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 3
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2025h: MA VV 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 3
On June 1, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-2025h 05/30/2023 (Vote 19-0; CC)
On May 23, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/30/2023 11:00 am LOB 302-304
- Subcommittee Work Session: 05/30/2023 09:30 am LOB 302-304
On May 19, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 05/23/2023 11:30 am LOB 302-304
On May 18, 2023 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MF DV 159-223 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 39
- Ought to Pass: MA DV 271-112 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 39
- Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 39
On May 8, 2023 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 04/26/2023 (Vote 10-9; RC)
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
On April 19, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/26/2023 09:30 am LOB 205-207
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/29/2023 01:00 pm LOB 201-203
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0838s, AA, VV; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0838s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0838s, 03/16/2023; SC 13
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0584s, AA, VV; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0584s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
On February 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0584s, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 11
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/25/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:30 am; SC 7
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 4