+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2013; Chapter 0180; Effective 01/01/2014
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, Recess of 6/5/13; HJ49, PG.1654
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sen. Rausch Moved Concur with House Amendment 1691h, MA, VV
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #1691h: MA VV; HJ43, PG.1471
- Amendment #1691h: AA VV; HJ43, PG.1471
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1691h; HC39, PG.1280
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1691h for May 22 (Vote 15-1; CC); HC39, PG.1262
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 5/14/2013 10:45 AM LOB 203
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 4/23/2013 1:45 PM LOB 203
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Transportation; HJ31, PG.1074
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 5
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/14/13; Vote 5-0; CC; SC8
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 2/5/13, Room 103, LOB, 1:15 p.m.; SC7
On January 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Transportation; SJ 4
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor