+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 17, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On May 1, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/17/2023 10:00 am LOB 301-303
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/19/2023 10:15 am LOB 301-303
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Legislative Administration
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0827s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0827s, AA, VV; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0827s, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 13
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/07/2023, Room 103, LOB, 09:30 am; SC 8
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 4