+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/01/2023; Chapter 0061; Effective 07/31/2023
On May 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 05/18/2023); SJ 16
On May 23, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 05/18/2023 HJ 14
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/04/2023 HJ 13 P. 15
On April 26, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/19/2023 (Vote 19-0; CC)
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/19/2023 11:30 am LOB 201-203
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/29/2023 11:30 am LOB 201-203
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/09/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/25/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:45 am; SC 7
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 4
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor