+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/29/2019; Chapter 301; Effective 07/01/2019
On July 12, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 56
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); SJ 21
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report # 2019-2518c, Adopted, VV; 06/27/2019; SJ 21
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2518c: Adopted, VV 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 3
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report # 2019-2518c Filed 06/13/2019; As Amended by the House
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/17/2019, 09:30 am, Room 100, SH
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Conferee Change: Rep. Cornell Replaces Rep. Myler 06/13/2019 HJ 19 P. 20
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Myler, Luneau, Ford, Weyler 06/06/2019 HJ 18 P. 45
- House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Myler): MA VV 06/06/2019 HJ 18 P. 45
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators D'Allesandro, Fuller Clark, Giuda; (In Recess 06/06/2019); SJ 20
- Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, MA, VV; (In Recess 06/06/2019); SJ 20
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2145h: MA VV 06/05/2019 HJ 17 P. 60
- Amendment # 2019-2145h: AA VV 06/05/2019 HJ 17 P. 60
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2145h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 22-0; RC) HC 27 P. 14
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/29/2019 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Division II Work Session: 05/22/2019 11:05 am LOB 209
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Division II & III Work Session: 05/21/2019 11:30 am LOB 210-211
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2019-1833h: 05/15/2019 10:00 am LOB 210-211 Division III & II
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Division II Work Session: 05/07/2019 11:00 am LOB 209
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/02/2019 HJ 14 P. 11
- Referred to Finance 05/02/2019 HJ 14 P. 11
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 15-3; RC) HC 22 P. 8
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/18/2019 10:00 am LOB 207
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/03/2019 11:00 am LOB 207
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Education HJ 11 P. 69
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; SJ 7
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2019; SC 12
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, SH, 02:00 pm; SC 9
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Finance; SJ 4
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor