+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 228; Effective 09/10/2019
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 53
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); SJ 21
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 06/13/2019; SJ 20
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2276h: MA VV 06/05/2019 HJ 17 P. 16
- Amendment # 2019-2276h: AA VV 06/05/2019 HJ 17 P. 16
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2276h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 27 P. 6
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/28/2019 10:30 am LOB 306
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 05/21/2019 10:00 am LOB 306
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 05/14/2019 10:00 am LOB 306
- Referred to Executive Departments and Administration 05/08/2019 HJ 15 P. 8
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1631h (NT): MA VV 05/08/2019 HJ 15 P. 8
- Amendment # 2019-1631h (NT): AA VV 05/08/2019 HJ 15 P. 8
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1631h (NT) for 05/08/2019 (Vote 22-0; CC) HC 23 P. 6
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/02/2019 10:00 am LOB 205
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 04/25/2019 10:00 am LOB 104
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/18/2019 10:00 am LOB 205
- Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2019 10:00 am LOB 104
- Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 04/16/2019 10:00 am LOB 104
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/09/2019 01:45 pm LOB 205
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 11 P. 73
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1194s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; SJ 10
- Committee Amendment # 2019-1194s, AA, VV; 03/27/2019; SJ 10
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1194s, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 15
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/13/2019, Room 101, LOB, 09:50 am; SC 12
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 4
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor