+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/18/2017; Chapter 0254; Effective 09/16/2017
On July 5, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/22/2017 HJ 19 P. 27
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); SJ 20
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report #2017-2344c, Adopted, VV; 06/22/2017; SJ 20
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2344c: Adopted, VV 06/22/2017 HJ 19 P. 6
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report #2017-2344c Filed 06/15/2017; Senate Amendment + New Amendment
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/14/2017, 03:00 pm, Room 103, LOB
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Abrami, Lang, Burns, Walz 06/08/2017 HJ 18 P. 6
- House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Packard): MA VV 06/08/2017 HJ 18 P. 6
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Sanborn, Giuda, D'Allesandro; 06/08/2017; SJ 19
- Sen. Sanborn Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, MA, VV; 06/08/2017; SJ 19
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1645h: MA VV 06/01/2017 HJ 17 P. 22
- Amendment #2017-1645h: AA VV 06/01/2017 HJ 17 P. 22
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1645h (NT) for 06/01/2017 (Vote 22-0; CC) HC 26 P. 10
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/17/2017 10:30 AM LOB 202
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/09/2017 01:00 PM LOB 202
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/26/2017 10:00 AM LOB 202
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Ways and Means HJ 11 P. 27
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: RC 14Y-8N, MA; OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; SJ 12
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/30/2017; SC 16
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/25/2017, Room 100, SH, 09:00 am; SC 7
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Ways and Means; SJ 4
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 30, 2017: Ought to Pass
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor