+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, RC 14Y-10N, MA; 03/12/2020; SJ 7
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Special Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, MA; 03/11/2020 SJ 6
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/11/2020; SC 10
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/03/2020, Room 100, SH, 01:45 pm; SC 9
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Finance; SJ 2
+ − Vote
March 12, 2020: Refer to Interim Study
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 24
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Nay
- David Watters: Yea
- Sharon Carson: Nay
- John Reagan: Nay
- Donna Soucy: Yea
- Lou D'Allesandro: Yea
- Martha Fuller Clark: Yea
- Chuck Morse: Nay
- Regina Birdsell: Nay
- Shannon Chandley: Yea
- James Gray: Nay
- Melanie Levesque: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Yea
- Dan Feltes: Yea
- Harold French: Nay
- Martha Hennessey: Yea
- Bob Giuda: Nay
- Ruth Ward: Nay
- Jay Kahn: Yea
- Kevin Cavanaugh: Yea
- David Starr: Nay
- Jeanne Dietsch: Yea
- Jon Morgan: Yea
- Tom Sherman: Yea