+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2023; Chapter 0098; Effective 08/19/2023
On June 13, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/08/2023 HJ 15
On June 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/08/2023); SJ 19
On May 18, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 4
On May 2, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/12/2023 01:00 pm LOB 306-308
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/12/2023 (Vote 18-0; CC)
On April 4, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/12/2023 01:00 pm LOB 306-308
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0860s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0860s, AA, VV; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0860s, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 13
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/25/2023, Room 103, SH, 09:15 am; SC 7
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 4
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor