+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, DIV. 13Y-11N, MA; 03/05/2020; SJ 5
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/05/2020; SC 9
- Special Order to 03/05/2020, Without Objection, MA; 02/13/2020 SJ 4
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/13/2020; SC 6
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/22/2020, Room 100, SH, 09:45 am; SC 3
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Ways and Means; SJ 2