+ − Actions (10)
On September 23, 2020 in the House:
- Died on Table
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Vacated and Laid on Table MA VV 06/30/2020 HJ 10 P. 4
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/19/2020 10:00 am LOB 205
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/18/2020 11:00 am LOB 205
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/17/2020 10:30 am LOB 205
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced 01/09/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/30/2020; SJ 2
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/30/2020; SC 4
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/21/2020, Room 101, LOB, 02:40 pm; SC 3
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor