+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On August 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2023; Chapter 0157; Effective 09/26/2023
On June 30, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 16
On June 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On June 8, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 2
On May 25, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/11/2023 (Vote 18-0; CC)
On May 3, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/10/2023 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 05/03/2023 10:10 am LOB 302-304
On April 5, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/12/2023 11:00 am LOB 302-304
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0569s, AA, VV; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0569s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0569s, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 11
On January 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 4
- Hearing: 01/18/2023, Room 103, SH, 10:15 am; SC 6