+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On October 31, 2024 in the House:
- Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 13-3)
On September 25, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/17/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On September 19, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 09/24/2024 01:00 pm LOB 302-304
On August 14, 2024 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 09/11/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On January 3, 2024 in the House:
- Refer for Interim Study: MA VV 01/03/2024 HJ 1 P. 37
On November 16, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 11/08/2023 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 49 P. 5
On November 8, 2023 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 11/15/2023 11:00 am LOB 302-304 HC 42
On October 17, 2023 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 11/08/2023 01:30 pm LOB 302-304 HC 42
On September 6, 2023 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2023 10:00 am LOB 302-304 HC 36
On August 30, 2023 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/06/2023 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On May 10, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On May 3, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/10/2023 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 05/03/2023 10:10 am LOB 302-304
On April 5, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/12/2023 10:30 am LOB 302-304
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/09/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9
On January 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 4
- Hearing: 01/17/2023, Room 100, SH, 09:45 am; SC 6
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor