+ − Actions (9)
On September 23, 2020 in the House:
- Died on Table
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Laid on Table MA VV 06/30/2020 HJ 10 P. 5
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1090s, RC 14Y-10N, MA; OT3rdg; 03/12/2020; SJ 7
- Without Objection, Sen. Hennessey Moved the Question, MA; 03/12/2020; SJ 7
- Committee Amendment # 2020-1090s, AA, VV; 03/12/2020; SJ 7
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Special Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, MA; 03/11/2020 SJ 6
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1090s, 03/11/2020; SC 10
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/19/2020, Room 102, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 7
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 2
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 12, 2020: Ought to Pass w/Amendment
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 24
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Nay
- David Watters: Yea
- Sharon Carson: Nay
- John Reagan: Nay
- Donna Soucy: Yea
- Lou D'Allesandro: Yea
- Martha Fuller Clark: Yea
- Chuck Morse: Nay
- Regina Birdsell: Nay
- Shannon Chandley: Yea
- James Gray: Nay
- Melanie Levesque: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Yea
- Dan Feltes: Yea
- Harold French: Nay
- Martha Hennessey: Yea
- Bob Giuda: Nay
- Ruth Ward: Nay
- Jay Kahn: Yea
- Kevin Cavanaugh: Yea
- David Starr: Nay
- Jeanne Dietsch: Yea
- Jon Morgan: Yea
- Tom Sherman: Yea