+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 02/09/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9
On January 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 4
- Hearing: 01/17/2023, Room 103, LOB, 10:15 am; SC 6