+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2023; Chapter 0096; Effective 06/20/2023
On June 13, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/08/2023 HJ 15
On June 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/08/2023); SJ 19
On May 18, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 3
On May 11, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/09/2023 (Vote 19-0; CC)
On May 2, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/09/2023 01:00 pm LOB 301-303
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/09/2023 09:30 am LOB 301-303
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/25/2023 12:30 pm LOB 301-303
On April 7, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 04/06/2023 and referred to Environment and Agriculture
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/30/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 15
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/24/2023, Room 103, SH, 09:45 am; SC 7
On January 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 4
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor