+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0315; Effective 06/30/2024
On July 15, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 51
On July 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Pearl Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- FLAM # 2024-1930h (NT) (Rep. D. McGuire): AA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 109
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1930h: MA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 110
On May 16, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/16/2024 (Vote 22-2; RC) HC 20 P. 25
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/13/2024 01:00 pm LOB 210-211
On April 17, 2024 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 05/07/2024 11:00 am LOB 212
On April 11, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/17/2024 01:30 pm LOB 210-211
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Finance HJ 10 P. 228
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: RC 23Y-0N, MA; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
On March 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2024, Vote 7-0; SC 11
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Special Order to The beginning of the Calendar, Without Objection, MA; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
On February 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2024, Vote 5-0; SC 9
On February 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/14/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:15 am; SC 7
On February 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/18/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 3
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor