+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0312; Effective 07/01/2024
On July 15, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 51
On July 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-1950h: AA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 40
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1950h: MA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 40
On May 15, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1950h 05/14/2024 (Vote 17-0; CC) HC 20 P. 13
On April 30, 2024 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/14/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/29/2024 10:30 am LOB 302-304
- Full committee Work Session: 04/29/2024 09:00 am LOB 302-304
On April 5, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/15/2024 09:00 am LOB 302-304
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy HJ 10 P. 228
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
On March 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2024, Vote 7-0; SC 11
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-0787s, AA, VV; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
- Sen. Avard Floor Amendment # 2024-1009s, AA, VV; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
- Ought to Pass with Amendments 2024-0787s, and 2024-1009s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
On February 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0787s, 03/07/2024, Vote 4-0; SC 9
On February 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/20/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:45 am; SC 8
On February 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/18/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 3
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor