+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On April 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/05/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 13
On February 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/20/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:15 am; SC 8
On February 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/18/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 3